MO SB280 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (1186S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (1186S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the assessment rate against public utilities
Title
Modifies the assessment rate against public utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (1186S.02C) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled |