MO SB28 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Requests to Recede or Grant Conference Calendar--SS for SCS for SB 28-Hegeman, with HCS, as amended (Senate requests House recede or grant conference)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Requests to Recede or Grant Conference Calendar--SS for SCS for SB 28-Hegeman, with HCS, as amended (Senate requests House recede or grant conference)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Low-Income Housing Tax Credit
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Low-Income Housing Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 28 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 28 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 143 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 28 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 28 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 143 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 28 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Requests to Recede or Grant Conference Calendar--SS for SCS for SB 28-Hegeman, with HCS, as amended (Senate requests House recede or grant conference) |
2019-05-16 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended, and requests H recede or grant conference |
2019-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2019-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(0200H12.03H) |
2019-05-08 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2019-05-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2019-04-30 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2019-02-26 | House | H Second Read |
2019-02-25 | House | H First Read |
2019-02-21 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-02-13 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2019-02-13 | Senate | SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(0200S11.10S) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & withdrawn (Hegeman)--(0200S11.09S) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Koenig)--(0200S11.01S) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Koenig)--(0200S11.02S) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Hegeman)--(0200S.11F) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development Committee w/SCS |
2019-02-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (0200S.06C) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 28-Hegeman |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |