MO SB28 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 28-Sater, with SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Social Services to apply for a global waiver for MO HealthNet

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Department of Social Services to apply for a global waiver for MO HealthNet

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 28-Sater, with SCS (pending)
2017-03-07SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-02-02SenateReported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee, with SCS
2017-02-01SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (0519S.05C)
2017-01-11SenateHearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2017-01-05SenateSecond Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 28-Sater
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback