MO SB276 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Defeated on H Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Defeated on H Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the third Thursday in November as the "Great American Smokeout Day"
Title
Designates the third Thursday in November as the "Great American Smokeout Day"
Sponsors
Sen. Gina Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Defeated on H Third Reading |
2015-05-11 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Cornejo)--(1392S01.02H) |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2015-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass H Trade & Tourism Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass H Trade & Tourism Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Hearing Conducted H Trade & Tourism Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred H Trade & Tourism Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-12 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-12 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws and Pensions Committee to Floor - Consent |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws and Pensions Committee - Consent |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2015-01-20 | Senate | S First Read--SB 276-Walsh |