MO SB266 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (0249S.07C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (0249S.07C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts new provisions of law relating to professional employer organizations
Title
Enacts new provisions of law relating to professional employer organizations
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (0249S.07C) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 266-Schatz |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57611600 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB266.pdf |