MO SB26 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-26 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Kansas City to employ airport police officers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows Kansas City to employ airport police officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-26SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-05SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 26-Curls
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback