MO SB256 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-21 - Hearing Conducted H Children and Families Committee
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a pilot program allowing noncustodial parents to reduce the amount of state debt owed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a pilot program allowing noncustodial parents to reduce the amount of state debt owed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-21HouseHearing Conducted H Children and Families Committee
2015-04-15HouseReferred H Children and Families Committee
2015-03-20HouseH Second Read
2015-03-19HouseH First Read
2015-03-19SenateS Third Read and Passed
2015-03-19SenateReported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
2015-03-18SenateVoted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2015-03-16SenateReferred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2015-03-12SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2015-03-11SenatePerfected
2015-03-05SenateReported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee to Floor
2015-03-04SenateVoted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2015-02-24SenateHearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2015-02-11SenateSecond Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2015-01-15SenateS First Read--SB 256-Sater and Nasheed

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback