MO SB255 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education and Workforce Development Committee (1082S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education and Workforce Development Committee (1082S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Education Savings Account program
Title
Establishing the Education Savings Account program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education and Workforce Development Committee (1082S.03C) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education and Workforce Development Committee |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education and Workforce Development Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |