MO SB252 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 252-Wieland, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 252-Wieland, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to insurance litigation
Title
Enacts provisions relating to insurance litigation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 252-Wieland, with SCS |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee w/SCS |
2019-02-20 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (0113S.02C) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2019-01-15 | Senate | S First Read--SB 252-Wieland |