MO SB25 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Bill Combined w/(SCS SBs 55, 25 & 23)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Bill Combined w/(SCS SBs 55, 25 & 23)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Empowerment Scholarship Accounts Program and modifies provisions related to charter schools
Title
Establishes the Missouri Empowerment Scholarship Accounts Program and modifies provisions related to charter schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | Senate | Bill Combined w/(SCS SBs 55, 25 & 23) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |