MO SB25 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to public safety

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to public safety

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-05-03HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
2017-05-02HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
2017-04-25HouseHearing Conducted H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
2017-04-06HouseReferred H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
2017-03-06HouseH Second Read
2017-03-02HouseH First Read
2017-03-01SenateS Third Read and Passed, as amended - Consent
2017-03-01SenateSA 1 S offered & adopted (Curls)--(0357S01.01S)
2017-03-01SenateSenate Rule 45 Suspended by unanimous consent
2017-02-16SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent
2017-02-02SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted
2017-02-02SenateVoted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-26SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-05SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 25-Curls
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback