MO SB248 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the expiration date for tax refund contributions to the Organ Donor Program Fund
Title
Repeals the expiration date for tax refund contributions to the Organ Donor Program Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] | Rep. Warren Love [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 248 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2017-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2017-05-02 | House | Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred H Ways and Means |
2017-02-16 | House | H Second Read |
2017-02-15 | House | H First Read |
2017-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee - Consent |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Ways and Means Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-01-05 | Senate | S First Read--SB 248-Kraus |