MO SB248 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to neighborhood improvement districts and delinquent property taxes
Title
Modifies provisions relating to neighborhood improvement districts and delinquent property taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2013-05-16 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed (0768S.04S) |
2013-05-16 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (0768S04.1SR) |
2013-05-15 | House | H submits CCR |
2013-05-14 | House | S conferees appointed: Wasson, Dixon, Cunningham, Justus, McKenna |
2013-05-14 | House | H conferees appointed: Fraker, Crawford, Kratky |
2013-05-14 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2013-05-13 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2013-05-13 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1 & HA 2 |
2013-05-08 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Crawford)--(0768S03.03H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Solon)--(0768S03.01H) |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass H Economic Development Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Economic Development Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Hearing Conducted H Economic Development Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred H Economic Development Committee |
2013-04-02 | House | H Second Read |
2013-03-28 | House | H First Read |
2013-03-28 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2013-03-28 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor-Consent, with SCS |
2013-03-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - (0768S.03C) - Consent |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | S First Read--SB 248-Wasson |