MO SB242 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 242-Emery, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 242-Emery, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rate Case Modernization Act
Title
Establishes the Rate Case Modernization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 242-Emery, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee w/SCS |
2017-02-22 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (1022S.03C) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 242-Emery |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled |