MO SB240 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a statewide license for electrical contractors
Title
Creates a statewide license for electrical contractors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 240 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid over |
2017-05-08 | House | Taken up |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Workforce Development |
2017-04-26 | House | Voted Do Pass H Workforce Development |
2017-04-26 | House | Hearing Conducted H Workforce Development |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred H Workforce Development |
2017-04-10 | House | H Second Read |
2017-04-06 | House | H First Read |
2017-04-06 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Perfected |
2017-04-03 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Brown)--(1045S03.02S) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(1045S03.01S) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee w/SCS |
2017-03-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (1045S.03C) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 240-Schatz |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled |