MO SB239 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 239-Rowden, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies certain provisions relating to licensure for the distribution and sale of alcohol

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies certain provisions relating to licensure for the distribution and sale of alcohol

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 239-Rowden, with SCS
2017-03-30SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-03-29SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS
2017-03-27SenateRemoved S Consent Calendar
2017-03-15SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS - Consent
2017-03-15SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted (1049S.04C)
2017-03-15SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1049S.04C)
2017-03-09SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-12SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 239-Rowden
2016-12-28SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback