MO SB236 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-20 - Bill Combined w/(SCSs SB 49, 236 & 164)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-20 - Bill Combined w/(SCSs SB 49, 236 & 164)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Missouri Save Adolescents from Experimentation (SAFE) Act"
Title
Establishes the "Missouri Save Adolescents from Experimentation (SAFE) Act"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | Senate | Bill Combined w/(SCSs SB 49, 236 & 164) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Emerging Issues Committee |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Emerging Issues Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |