MO SB234 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 234-White
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts provisions relating to disability accommodations for commercial driver's license applicants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts provisions relating to disability accommodations for commercial driver's license applicants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 234-White
2019-04-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-14SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-03-07SenateVoted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-02-28SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-02-07SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-01-10SenateS First Read--SB 234-White

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback