MO SB234 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 234-Libla, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 234-Libla, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions requiring a landlord to keep security deposits in a trust
Title
Repeals provisions requiring a landlord to keep security deposits in a trust
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 234-Libla, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business and Industry Committee w/SCS |
2017-02-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee (0901S.03C) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 234-Libla |
2016-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled |