MO SB234 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires an applicant for a marital and family therapist license to show a master's or doctoral degree from a Commission on Accreditation for Marriage and Family Therapy accredited program
Title
Requires an applicant for a marital and family therapist license to show a master's or doctoral degree from a Commission on Accreditation for Marriage and Family Therapy accredited program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-02 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-01 | House | H Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent |
2013-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee - Consent |
2013-04-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee - Consent |
2013-04-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | H Second Read |
2013-03-11 | House | H First Read |
2013-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor - Consent |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | S First Read--SB 234-Wasson |