MO SB232 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 232-Kehoe, with SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 232-Kehoe, with SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates additional requirements for tow truck businesses
Title
Creates additional requirements for tow truck businesses
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 232-Kehoe, with SCS (pending) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-04-01 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1208S.02C) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-01-13 | Senate | S First Read--SB 232-Kehoe |