MO SB23 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Bill Combined w/(SCS SBs 55, 25 & 23)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Bill Combined w/(SCS SBs 55, 25 & 23)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Empowerment Scholarship Accounts Program
Title
Establishes the Missouri Empowerment Scholarship Accounts Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | Senate | Bill Combined w/(SCS SBs 55, 25 & 23) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |