MO SB228 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 228-Sater, with HA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 228-Sater, with HA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies methods of service of notice under employment security laws
Title
Modifies methods of service of notice under employment security laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 228 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 96 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 228 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 228 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | S Bills with H Amendments--SB 228-Sater, with HA 1 |
2019-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2019-05-16 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Lynch)--(0982S01.01H) |
2019-05-15 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Small Business |
2019-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Small Business |
2019-04-17 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Small Business |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Small Business |
2019-04-01 | House | H Second Read |
2019-03-28 | House | H First Read |
2019-03-28 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business and Industry Committee - Consent |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Small Business and Industry Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 228-Sater |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled |