MO SB227 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Hearing Scheduled S Economic Development Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Hearing: Mar 2 @ 7:00 pm in Senate Lounge
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows, rather than requires, the Department of Economic Development to recapture certain tax incentives

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows, rather than requires, the Department of Economic Development to recapture certain tax incentives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateHearing Scheduled S Economic Development Committee
2021-01-28SenateSecond Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback