MO SB227 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 227-Koenig, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 227-Koenig, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the practice of cosmetology and the practice of the occupation of a barber does not include hair braiding
Title
Provides that the practice of cosmetology and the practice of the occupation of a barber does not include hair braiding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 227-Koenig, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee w/SCS |
2017-02-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (0504S.05C) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 227-Koenig |
2016-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled |