MO SB225 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to the liability of businesses prohibiting firearms on the premises
Title
Creates provisions relating to the liability of businesses prohibiting firearms on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |