MO SB225 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (0969S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (0969S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the concealed carry of firearms on public transportation systems and the transporting of non-functioning or unloaded firearms on public buses
Title
Allows the concealed carry of firearms on public transportation systems and the transporting of non-functioning or unloaded firearms on public buses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (0969S.03C) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |