MO SB225 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 225-Curls
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 225-Curls
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies nuisance actions in certain cities and counties
Title
Modifies nuisance actions in certain cities and counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 225-Curls |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S Progress and Development Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 225-Curls |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1098944 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB225.pdf |