MO SB225 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to transportation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 225 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 129 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 225 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 122 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 225 (*HA 5) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 225 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 225 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSigned by Governor
2017-05-22SenateDelivered to Governor
2017-05-22SenateSigned by House Speaker
2017-05-22SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2017-05-22SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2017-05-12SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2017-05-12SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed
2017-05-12SenateH adopts CCR
2017-05-12SenateReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2017-05-12SenateVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2017-05-11HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2017-05-11HouseCCR S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(0915S04.1SR)
2017-05-11HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2017-05-11HouseH distributes CCR (0915S04.1SR)
2017-05-10HouseS conferees appointed: Schatz, Wasson, Munzlinger, Hummel, Schupp
2017-05-10HouseH conferees appointed: Davis, Fraker, McGaugh, Runions, Burns
2017-05-10HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2017-05-10HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
2017-05-10HouseH Third Read and Passed
2017-05-10HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2017-05-10HouseHA 10 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2017-05-10HouseHA 2 to HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kolkmeyer)--(0915H03.36H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 1 to HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (McCaherty)--(0915H03.33H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 10 to HCS H offered (Korman)--(0915H03.16H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 9 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2017-05-10HouseHA 1 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Christofanelli)--(0915H03.34H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 9 to HCS H offered (Shumake)--(0915H03.24H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(0915H03.13H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 7 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2017-05-10HouseHA 1 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(0915H03.37H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Love)--(0915H03.31H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(0915H03.26H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered & defeated (Berry)--(0915H03.29H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Alferman)--(0915H03.30H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Basye)--(0915H03.05H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fraker)--(0915H03.14H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davis)--(0915H03.22H)
2017-05-01HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2017-05-01HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2017-04-27HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2017-04-27HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation
2017-04-26HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation
2017-04-26HouseHearing Conducted H Transportation
2017-04-19HouseReferred H Transportation
2017-03-06HouseH Second Read
2017-03-02HouseH First Read
2017-03-01SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2017-02-16SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent
2017-02-02SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted
2017-02-02SenateVoted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-26SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-12SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 225-Schatz
2016-12-20SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback