MO SB225 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 225-Romine, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 225-Romine, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies Department of Natural Resources permit decision appeal procedures
Title
Modifies Department of Natural Resources permit decision appeal procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Romine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 225-Romine, with SCS |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-03-17 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (0375S.04C) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-01-12 | Senate | S First Read--SB 225-Romine |