MO SB224 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain MO HealthNet participants to comply with work and community engagement requirements
Title
Requires certain MO HealthNet participants to comply with work and community engagement requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |