MO SB220 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 220-Riddle, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 220-Riddle, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a person who is injured by a product has 10 years after the sale or lease of the product to bring a suit for damages
Title
Provides that a person who is injured by a product has 10 years after the sale or lease of the product to bring a suit for damages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 220-Riddle, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal |
2017-04-05 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Riddle)--(0886S.04F) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee w/SCS |
2017-02-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (0886S.03C) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 220-Riddle |
2016-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled |