MO SB22 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
2021-02-22SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2021-02-04SenateReported from S Ways and Means Committee
2021-02-04SenateVoted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
2021-02-04SenateHearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
2021-01-28SenateHearing Cancelled S Ways and Means Committee
2021-01-25SenateHearing Cancelled S Ways and Means Committee
2021-01-21SenateHearing Cancelled S Ways and Means Committee
2021-01-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback