MO SB215 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions authorizing regional economic development districts
Title
Repeals provisions authorizing regional economic development districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |