MO SB212 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the Department of Corrections, the Division of Probation and Parole, and the Parole Board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the Department of Corrections, the Division of Probation and Parole, and the Parole Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateFormal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
2021-04-08SenateReferred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2021-04-08SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2021-04-07SenatePerfected
2021-04-07SenateSS, as amended, S aodpted
2021-04-07SenateSA 5 to SS, as amended, S adopted
2021-04-07SenateSA 2 to SA 5 to SS S offered & adopted (White)--(0457S02.10S)
2021-04-07SenateSA 1 to SA 5 to SS S offered & adopted (Burlison)--(0457S02.08S)
2021-04-07SenateSA 5 to SS S offered (Roberts)--(0457S02.04S)
2021-04-07SenateSA 4 to SS S offered & adopted (Brattin)--(0457S02.03S)
2021-04-07SenateSA 3 to SS S offered & adopted (Brown)--(0457S02.07S)
2021-04-07SenateSA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(0457S02.02S)
2021-04-07SenateSA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(0457S02.05S)
2021-04-07SenateSS for SB 212 (White)--(0457S.02F)
2021-02-25SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2021-02-08SenateVoted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2021-02-01SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2021-01-28SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=54105552
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/intro/SB212.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/perf/SB212.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3545
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3546
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3548
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3549
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3550
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3551
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3554
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3557
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=134080607&BillID=54105552
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/0457S.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=142102040&BillID=54105552
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=142120879&BillID=54105552
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/0457S.02P.ORG.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback