MO SB210 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 210-Onder, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to collective bargaining representation for public employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to collective bargaining representation for public employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 210-Onder, with SCS
2017-03-30SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-02-16SenateReported from S General Laws Committee w/SCS
2017-02-01SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (0510S.03C)
2017-01-25SenateHearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
2017-01-12SenateSecond Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 210-Onder
2016-12-16SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback