MO SB207 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (1062S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the administrative adjudication of certain municipal ordinance violations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the administrative adjudication of certain municipal ordinance violations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (1062S.02C)
2019-02-20SenateHearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-01-31SenateSecond Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 207-Emery
2019-01-04SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback