MO SB205 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 205-Arthur, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 205-Arthur, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the A+ Schools Program
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the A+ Schools Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 205-Arthur, with SCS |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee w/SCS |
2019-03-12 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (1233S.03C) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 205-Arthur |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled |