MO SB204 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions related to computer science courses offered in elementary and secondary schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions related to computer science courses offered in elementary and secondary schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
2021-04-15SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2021-03-11SenateReported from S Education Committee w/SCS
2021-03-09SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (1082S.02C)
2021-03-02SenateHearing Conducted S Education Committee
2021-02-23SenateHearing Cancelled S Education Committee
2021-02-16SenateHearing Cancelled S Education Committee
2021-01-28SenateSecond Read and Referred S Education Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback