MO SB204 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - In Conference--SB 204-Riddle, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - In Conference--SB 204-Riddle, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to professional registration
Title
Modifies provisions relating to professional registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 204 (HA 3) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 204 (HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 204 (*HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 204 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 204 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 204 (HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 204 (*HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 204 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 204 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | In Conference--SB 204-Riddle, with HCS, as amended |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate conferees allowed to exceed differences in Chapter 334 (Riddle) |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Riddle, White, Hough, Walsh, Sifton |
2019-05-16 | House | House conferees appointed: Ross, Helms, Schroer, Lavender, Beck |
2019-05-16 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2019-05-16 | House | S refuses to concur in SB 204-Riddle, with HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2019-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 15 to HCS H withdrawn |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HA 15 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Sain)--(0840H02.35H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 15 to HCS H offered (Grier)--(0840H02.17H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pike)--(0840H02.40H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roden)--(0840H02.29H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gregory)--(0840H02.28H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Swan)--(0840H02.22H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Stephens-128)--(0840H02.26H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Muntzel)--(0840H02.18H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGirl)--(0840H02.04H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 7 to HCS H adopted |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & defeated (Coleman-97)--(0840H02.37H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered (Patterson)--(0840H02.12H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hannegan)--(0840H02.01H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HSA 1 for HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Mayhew)--(0840H02.34H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered (Miller)--(0840H02.21H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelly-141)--(0840H02.32H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schroer)--(0840H02.06H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ross)--(0840H02.07H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schroer)--(0840H02.31H) |
2019-05-14 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2019-05-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2019-04-24 | House | Hearing Conducted H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2019-04-23 | House | Hearing Cancelled H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2019-03-27 | House | H Second Read |
2019-03-26 | House | H First Read |
2019-03-26 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee - Consent |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Professional Registration Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 204-Riddle |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled |