MO SB203 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies nuisance actions in certain cities and counties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies nuisance actions in certain cities and counties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 203 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 203 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29SenateSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-17SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-17HouseS Third Read and Passed
2019-05-17HouseS concurs in HCS, as amended
2019-05-17HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-17HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-17HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Plocher)--(1191H07.22H)
2019-05-16HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-15HouseBill Placed on Formal Calendar
2019-05-14HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-09HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-08HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-06HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws
2019-05-02HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws
2019-04-30HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2019-04-29HouseRe-referred H General Laws
2019-04-24HouseReferred H Local Government
2019-04-24HouseH Second Read
2019-04-23HouseH First Read
2019-04-18SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-04-16SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-04-16SenatePerfected
2019-04-16SenateSCS, as amended, S adopted
2019-04-16SenateSA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Cunningham)--(1191S06.08S)
2019-04-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-28SenateReported from S Progress and Development Committee w/SCS
2019-03-28SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee (1191S.06C)
2019-03-12SenateHearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee
2019-02-27SenateRe-referred S Progress and Development Committee
2019-01-31SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 203-Nasheed
2019-01-03SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=891280
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB203.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/comm/SB203.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/perf/SB203.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0203.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/tat/SB203.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay540418762-783.pdf#770
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.020.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.019.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6805171607-1684.pdf#1678
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6905171607-1684.pdf#1678

Bill Comments

feedback