MO SB202 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates provisions relating to mining royalties on federal land

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates provisions relating to mining royalties on federal land

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 202 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 120 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 202 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 202 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 109 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12SenateVetoed by Governor
2019-05-29SenateDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29SenateSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-17SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-17SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed
2019-05-17SenateH adopts CCR
2019-05-16HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2019-05-16HouseCCR S offered & adopted (Romine)--(1181S04.1SR)
2019-05-16HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-16HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-16HouseReferred H Fiscal Review
2019-05-16HouseH distributes CCR (1181S04.1SR)
2019-05-13HouseSenate conferees appointed: Romine, Libla, Wallingford, Sifton, Holsman
2019-05-13HouseHouse conferees appointed: Dinkins, Hansen, Shawan, Lavender, McCreery
2019-05-09HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2019-05-08HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
2019-05-08HouseMotion to adopt HCS, as amended, (Romine) - Motion withdrawn
2019-05-08HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-08HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-08HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dinkins)--(1181H03.02H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hansen)--(1181H03.04H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hansen)--(1181H03.03H)
2019-05-08HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-02HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-02HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-25HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-25HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-04-24HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-04-15HouseHearing Conducted H Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-04-10HouseReferred H Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-03-18HouseH Second Read
2019-03-14HouseH First Read
2019-03-14SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-03-12SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-03-12SenatePerfected
2019-02-28SenateReported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2019-02-20SenateVoted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2019-02-13SenateHearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2019-01-31SenateSecond Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 202-Romine
2019-01-03SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback