MO SB20 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Removed from H Informal Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Removed from H Informal Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the expiration of a criminal court surcharge for the DNA Profiling Analysis fund from August 28, 2019, to August 28, 2029
Title
Extends the expiration of a criminal court surcharge for the DNA Profiling Analysis fund from August 28, 2019, to August 28, 2029
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Removed from H Informal Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules |
2019-04-24 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2019-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2019-04-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2019-02-19 | House | H Second Read |
2019-02-18 | House | H First Read |
2019-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 20-Libla |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |