MO SB199 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee
Pending: Senate Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee
Pending: Senate Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Missouri Secure Choice Savings Program Act
Title
Creates the Missouri Secure Choice Savings Program Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 199-Arthur |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=851548 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB199.pdf |