MO SB199 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows an Armed Offender Docket in Jackson County and modifies the self-defense statute and the statute specifying when police officers are justified in using deadly force
Title
Allows an Armed Offender Docket in Jackson County and modifies the self-defense statute and the statute specifying when police officers are justified in using deadly force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated |
2015-05-15 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2015-05-15 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Austin)--(0972H09.02H) |
2015-05-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/HCA 1 & HCA 2 |
2015-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/Amendments |
2015-05-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2015-04-30 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-29 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-29 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-27 | Senate | SS#2 to SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-04-27 | Senate | SA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (Nasheed)--(0972S06.03S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0972S06.01S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S offered (Dixon)--(0972S.06F) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2015-04-27 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered (Brown)--(0972S05.03S) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0972S05.05S) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-21 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0972S05.01S) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Dixon)--(0972S.05F) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-03-17 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 199, 417 & 42) S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0972S.04C) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 199-Dixon |