MO SB196 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Division of State Parks
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Division of State Parks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: SB 196 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: SB 196 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2019-05-06 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-06 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2019-05-06 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Roberts-161)--(1055H03.08H) |
2019-05-06 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Anderson)--(1055H03.07H) |
2019-05-06 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wood)--(1055H03.04H) |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-18 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Tourism |
2019-04-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Tourism |
2019-04-11 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Tourism |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Tourism |
2019-03-11 | House | H Second Read |
2019-03-07 | House | H First Read |
2019-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 196-Bernskoetter |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled |