MO SB194 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates offenses relating to the unlawful use of an unmanned aircraft

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates offenses relating to the unlawful use of an unmanned aircraft

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-09HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Corrections and Public Institutions
2019-04-09HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Corrections and Public Institutions
2019-04-02HouseHearing Conducted H Corrections and Public Institutions
2019-03-27HouseReferred H Corrections and Public Institutions
2019-03-11HouseH Second Read
2019-03-07HouseH First Read
2019-03-07SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-02-28SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-02-27SenatePerfected
2019-02-27SenateSS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Hoskins)--(0777S.07F)
2019-02-27SenateSS for SCS S withdrawn
2019-02-25SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-02-25SenateSS for SCS S offered (Hoskins)--(0777S.04F)
2019-02-14SenateSCS Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-02-11SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0777S.03C)
2019-02-04SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-01-31SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 194-Hoskins
2018-12-20SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback