MO SB194 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/House amendments (In Fiscal Review)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/House amendments (In Fiscal Review)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a managed care plan's network is adequate if the health carrier is accredited by the Accreditation Association for Ambulatory Health Care
Title
Provides that a managed care plan's network is adequate if the health carrier is accredited by the Accreditation Association for Ambulatory Health Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - House: SB 194 (*HA 1 HA 19) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: SB 194 (*HA 1 HA 19) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: SB 194 (HA 19, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: SB 194 (*HA 19, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: SB 194 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: SB 194 (*HA 1 HA 19) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: SB 194 (HA 19, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: SB 194 (*HA 19, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: SB 194 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/House amendments (In Fiscal Review) |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 21 H offered & adopted (Dodan)--(0792S01.42H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 20 H offered & adopted (Bondon)--(0792S01.04H) |
2017-05-01 | House | HA 19, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 19 H offered & adopted (Moon)--(0792S01.79H) |
2017-05-01 | House | HA 19 H offered (Brattin)--(0792S01.40H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 18 H offered & adopted (Hubrecht)--(0792S01.14H) |
2017-05-01 | House | HA 17, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 17 H offered & adopted (Walker)--(0792S01.75H) |
2017-05-01 | House | HA 17 H offered (Sommer)--(0792S01.05H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 16 H offered & adopted (Schroer)--(0792S01.60H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 15 H offered & adopted (Dunn)--(0792S01.44H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 14, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 14 H offered & adopted (McCreery)--(0792S01.73H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 14 H offered (Evans)--(0792S01.03H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 13 H offered (Pike)--(0792S01.41H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 12 H offered & adopted (Lauer)--(0792S01.39H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 11, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 11 H offered & adopted (Morris)--(0792S01.67H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 11 H offered (Crawford)--(0792S01.25H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 10 H offered & adopted (Lichtenegger)--(0792S01.38H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 9 H offered & adopted (Taylor)--(0792S01.52H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 8 H offered & adopted (Barnes)--(0792S01.62H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 7 H offered & adopted (Smith)--(0792S01.49H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 6 H offered & adopted (Rowland)--(0792S01.63H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 5, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 5 H offered & adopted (Pike)--(0792S01.57H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 5 H offered (Ruth)--(0792S01.13H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 4 H offered & adopted (Haefner)--(0792S01.36H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Franklin)--(0792S01.07H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Helm)--(0792S01.51H) |
2017-05-02 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Trent)--(0792S01.53H) |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Consent and House Procedure - Not Consent |
2017-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass H Consent and House Procedure - Not Consent |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred H Consent and House Procedure |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy - Consent |
2017-04-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy - Consent |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee Vote Reconsidered |
2017-04-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy - Consent |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2017-03-06 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-02 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee - Consent |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Health and Pensions Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 194-Wallingford |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled |