MO SB192 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to products liability claims
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to products liability claims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 192-Munzlinger |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=822138 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB192.pdf |