MO SB19 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions of law relating to labor organizations
Title
Creates new provisions of law relating to labor organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - House: SB 19 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: SB 19 (*HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - House - House: SB 19 (*HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Order Perfected (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: SB 19 (*HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - House - House: SB 19 (*HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Order Perfected (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-02-02 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-02-02 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-02-02 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-02-02 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-02-02 | House | HA 3 H offered & defeated (Rowland)--(0269S05.03H) |
2017-02-02 | House | HA 2 H offered & defeated (Rowland)--(0269S05.02H) |
2017-02-02 | House | HA 1 H offered & defeated (Beck)--(0269S05.01H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Economic Development |
2017-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Economic Development Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | Hearing Conducted H Economic Development |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred H Economic Development |
2017-01-27 | House | H Second Read |
2017-01-26 | House | H First Read |
2017-01-26 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Perfected |
2017-01-25 | Senate | SS#2 S adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | SA 6 to SS#2 S offered & defeated (Silvey)--(0269S05.04S) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | SA 5 to SS#2 S offered & defeated (Walsh)--(0269S05.03S) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | SA 4 to SS#2 S offered & defeated (Sifton)--(0269S05.05S) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | SA 3 to SS#2 S offered & defeated (Walsh)--(0269S04.34S) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | SA 2 to SS#2 S offered & defeated (Schupp)--(0269S05.02F) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 S offered & defeated (Walsh)--(0269S05.01F) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | SS#2 S offered (Brown)--(0269S.05F) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-01-23 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered (Walsh)--(0269S04.01F) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & defeated (Holsman)--(0269S04.50S) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | SS S offered (Brown)--(0269S.04F) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 19-Brown |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |